CO SB152 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the continuation of the public safety communications subcommittee, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendations contained in the 2018 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunset Public Safety Communications Subcommittee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer Senate Bill 19-152 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-152 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12 Governor Signed
2019-04-03 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-22HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-21HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-18HouseHouse Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture
2019-03-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-08SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-152
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_152_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_152_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_152_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_152_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_152_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_152_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1cf8d367b816e8a9872583b40075bb2b-sb19-152-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-152vote59a820
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3ae321c8d4f1dcec872583c1006b7882-sb19-152-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-152vote55abe8

Bill Comments

feedback