CO SB152 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning correction of the effective date clause of Senate Bill 19-263 for the purpose of ensuring that the bill accomplishes its intended legal effect of eliminating the requirement that the state treasurer execute lease-purchase agreements to fund transportation projects during the 2020-21 and 2021-22 state fiscal years if a referred ballot issue that authorizes the state to issue transportation revenue anticipation notes is approved at the 2020 general election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correct Senate Bill 19-263 Effective Date Error

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 20-152 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 20-152 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor Signed
2020-03-14 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-09HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-06HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-03-05HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-03HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government
2020-02-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-07SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-04SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-01-29SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-152
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_152_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_152_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_152_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_152_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_152_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_152_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a686f6305a49dcda8725850400739cfc-sb20-152-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-152vote5eba25
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/264e7357f737a9ef872585200063c41f-sb20-152-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-152vote5c4744

Bill Comments

feedback