CO SB163 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the modernization of the school entry immunization process, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Entry Immunization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-13 - Joint - CC_SB20-163_2020A: Adopt the conference committee report. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Third Reading Rerefer (hi) (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.079) (Y: 29 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.099) (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.089) (Y: 24 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.097) (Y: 26 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.092) (Y: 23 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.087) (Y: 22 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.086) (Y: 23 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-163 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-07 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 20-163 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.005) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.004) (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.003) (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-163, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-163 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26 Governor Signed
2020-06-19 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-13SenateSenate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2020-06-13HouseHouse Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2020-06-13 First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Reengrossed w/ Amendments
2020-06-13SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
2020-06-10HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-09HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-06-09HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-06-07HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-03-02HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
2020-02-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-27SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-02-25SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-19SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-02-11SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-163
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_163_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_163_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_163_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_163_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_163_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_163_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3a53d02aa25efc2787258513005eb25b-sb20-163-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/72c483d447b7b0c98725851900556654-sb20-163-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/72c483d447b7b0c98725851900556654-sb20-163-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote736e3c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote72f534
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote723c80
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote727f2a
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote631b39
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/82a55df716768cff8725858000631149-sb20-163-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/61b6b9f950081e8a87258582004f18d3-sb20-163-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote837ffb
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote82f99d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote82aa0d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote826b4e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote82d43e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote8320d9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote8357ba
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote5f1e2e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote658a31
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote650e9d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote5f03f0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote6e6430
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote6e7c92
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote03b1aa
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-163vote0316c1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/50cc9e38666807c787258586006abb52-sb20-163-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback