CO SB166 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning simplifying the requirements for a minor to obtain a new birth certificate from the state registrar.
Title
Simplifying Requirements For New Birth Certificate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-166 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-166, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-166, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-166 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-166, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 20-166, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-05 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-01 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 06/04/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |