CO SB177 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning matters related to background checks for persons who have contact with children.
Title
Background Checks Persons Who Work With Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.002) (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-177 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-177 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-177 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-177 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-177 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-177, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-177, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.002) (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-177 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-177 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-177 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-177 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-177 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-177, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-177, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-30 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-29 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to Finance |
2019-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Finance |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |