CO SB185 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the Colorado imagination library program.
Title
The Colorado Imagination Library Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-185 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 20-185, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 20-185, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-185, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-185, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 20-185 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-185 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 20-185, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 20-185, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-185, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-185, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 20-185 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-09 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-06-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 06/3/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |