CO SB190 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures to increase the number of individuals who are well-prepared to teach in public schools, and, in connection therewith, creating the "Growing Great Teachers Act" and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher Preparation Program Support

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-190, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-190, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-190, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-190, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-190, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-190, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-190, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Governor Signed
2019-05-07 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-07HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-30SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-27HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-26HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-25HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-25HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-17HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education
2019-04-17SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-16SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-16SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-04SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-03-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-190
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_190_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_190_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_190_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_190_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_190_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_190_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/216b87085e70a96f872583d200785753-sb19-190-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e32717e6a4c7e066872583de00535598-sb19-190-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e32717e6a4c7e066872583de00535598-sb19-190-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-190vote5c676d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/216b87085e70a96f872583d200785753-sb19-190-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6b62809554527bf2872583e50075d856-sb19-190-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/91db6cfabfa28c54872583e700515f20-sb19-190-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/91db6cfabfa28c54872583e700515f20-sb19-190-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6b62809554527bf2872583e50075d856-sb19-190-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-190vote5df8fc
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-190vote3d929e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-190vote3d86cf

Bill Comments

feedback