CO SB193 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the "Colorado Medical Practice Act", and, in connection therewith, continuing the Colorado medical board, eliminating the sixty-day limit on the pro bono license, repealing the requirement that a letter of admonition be sent to licensees by certified mail, and updating language and making technical amendments.
Title
Sunset Continue Colorado Medical Practice Act
Sponsors
Sen. Joann Ginal [D] | Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Rep. Kerry Tipper [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-193 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-193, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-193, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-193 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-193 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-193, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-193, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-193 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-193, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-193, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-193 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-193 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-193, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-193, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-26 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |