CO SB198 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continued management of waste tires, and, in connection therewith, making and reducing an appropriation.
Title
Continued Management Of Waste Tires
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Todd [D] | Sen. Donald Coram [R] | Rep. Bri Buentello [D] | Rep. Matt Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-198 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-198 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-198 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-198, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-198, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-198 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-198 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-198 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-198, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-198, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-26 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Finance |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |