CO SB199 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures to support effective implementation of the "Colorado Reading to Ensure Academic Development Act" for all students who receive services pursuant to READ plans, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

READ Act Implementation Measures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-199 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-199 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-199, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 19-199, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Governor Signed
2019-05-07 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-07HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-30HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-27HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-25HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education
2019-04-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-19SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-11SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-03-18SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-199
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_199_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_199_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_199_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_199_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_199_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_199_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1f44c5015fcf9752872583d90073cc76-sb19-199-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3465b67269a04456872583e10057bb83-sb19-199-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3465b67269a04456872583e10057bb83-sb19-199-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3465b67269a04456872583e10057bb83-sb19-199-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-199vote610260
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bc4999d1c9be6487872583e7007d4c9f-sb19-199-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/41ebe8fb46fb6e69872583e9004ddee9-sb19-199-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-199vote59404e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5752147e026bab36872583d8005d6b0b-sb19-199-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5752147e026bab36872583d8005d6b0b-sb19-199-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5752147e026bab36872583d8005d6b0b-sb19-199-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5752147e026bab36872583d8005d6b0b-sb19-199-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback