CO SB201 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of a process by which certain parties to an adverse health care incident may discuss potential outcomes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Open Discussions About Adverse Health Care Incidents

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-201 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.003) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-201, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06 Governor Signed
2019-04-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-25HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-17HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-16HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-11HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-29HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-03-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-03-27SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-201
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_201_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_201_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_201_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_201_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_201_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_201_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/96cd5541775c4f20872583c80070826f-sb19-201-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-201vote5f2396
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-201vote5f38a7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/96cd5541775c4f20872583c80070826f-sb19-201-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f207791766d5f92d872583d9007b2ddf-sb19-201-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-201vote55c897

Bill Comments

feedback