CO SB205 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of a license plate to honor women veterans of the United States armed forces, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honor Service Of Women Veterans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-205 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-205 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-205 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-205 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20 Governor Signed
2019-05-08 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-08SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-27HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-26HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-24HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-19HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance
2019-04-19SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-18SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-16SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-09SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-04SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Finance
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-205
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_205_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_205_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_205_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_205_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_205_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_205_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ea19f21db2c0c76f872583d20056b836-sb19-205-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/93676bbd7a71cde7872583d7006f2468-sb19-205-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/387ea87ded64b5c5872583de0053fae1-sb19-205-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/387ea87ded64b5c5872583de0053fae1-sb19-205-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-205vote2992f4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/dc6c3ca1ab3f7204872583e6006b6a11-sb19-205-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ef6c393b7b9c41bf872583e8004f4b59-sb19-205-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-205vote5d0997

Bill Comments

feedback