CO SB210 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning juvenile detention beds, and, in connection therewith, reducing appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Detention Beds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-210 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-210 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16 Governor Signed
2019-04-12 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-12HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-04HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-02HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-29HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2019-03-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-27SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-210
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_210_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_210_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_210_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_210_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_210_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_210_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4ea3729990c95740872583c9004b9a39-sb19-210-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-210vote57712d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/21ff151f34ba6f15872583d0004b8fbe-sb19-210-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-210vote5a0d59

Bill Comments

feedback