CO SB214 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning capital-related transfers of money.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capital-related Transfers Of Money

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Recede (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Concur In House Amendment (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Byd Scp (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur Appt Cc (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-214 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-214 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03 Governor Signed
2019-04-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-18SenateSenate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2019-04-18SenateSenate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Reconsider - CCR produced
2019-04-17SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-17SenateSenate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Recede - CCR produced
2019-04-16HouseHouse Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2019-04-09SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
2019-04-08HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-05HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-02HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-29HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2019-03-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-27SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-214
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_214_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_214_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_214_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_214_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_214_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_214_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/867bf4106313d4ae872583c9004c43ca-sb19-214-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-214vote57713d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7c98af017bae0f07872583d0004c1169-sb19-214-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-214vote58ae47
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-214vote565229
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-214vote5e00b9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-214vote5f5d4c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-214vote5f4d62
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-214vote5eb6f2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-214vote5e9f9d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-214vote5e92c2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-214vote5665fa
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-214vote567c71

Bill Comments

feedback