CO SB218 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures by the department of public health and environment to protect the public from certain hazardous substances, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CDPHE Colorado Department Of Public Health And Environment Hazardous Substances Response

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-218, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-218 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-218, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-218, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-218, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-29 Governor Signed
2020-06-23SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-15SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-06-13HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-12HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-06-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-06-11HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-06-11HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-06-10HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
2020-06-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-09SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-06-09SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-06SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-06-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-218
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_218_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_218_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_218_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_218_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_218_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_218_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4f235db9e9d7c77a8725857f0066a191-sb20-218-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cfedd55e78f1041c872585820050dd9c-sb20-218-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cfedd55e78f1041c872585820050dd9c-sb20-218-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-218vote578c03
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0019786a7981fc2687258584007e6d2a-sb20-218-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d0793e91028bbb5b87258584006b4f7b-sb20-218-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-218vote5ad1e0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-218vote5d2b31
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-218vote5d0936
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0019786a7981fc2687258584007e6d2a-sb20-218-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback