CO SB222 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning reimbursing prosecuting attorneys for costs associated with litigating rule 35 of the Colorado criminal procedure motions.
Title
Reimburse Attorney General Or District Attorneys For Rule 35 Motion Costs
Sponsors
Sen. John Cooke [R] | Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Rep. Cole Wist [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 18-222 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-222, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-08 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 18-222 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - : Postpone Senate Bill 18-222 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-222 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-222, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-08 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 18-222 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - : Postpone Senate Bill 18-222 indefinitely. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-222 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-05-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |