CO SB222 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the improvement of access to behavioral health services for individuals at risk of institutionalization, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individuals At Risk Of Institutionalization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-222 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-222 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-222, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-222, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-222, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-27HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-25HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-04-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-19SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-12SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-10SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2019-03-29SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-222
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_222_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_222_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_222_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_222_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_222_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_222_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/615347f2ce8ba8fe872583da00693a2d-sb19-222-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ea8aea7a48584db3872583e1005826bb-sb19-222-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ea8aea7a48584db3872583e1005826bb-sb19-222-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/615347f2ce8ba8fe872583da00693a2d-sb19-222-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/615347f2ce8ba8fe872583da00693a2d-sb19-222-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-222vote69fb73
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/aba2153a9e52230b872583e70079356e-sb19-222-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/52e04b9fc4782418872583e9004df14a-sb19-222-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-222vote583386
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-222vote5835fa

Bill Comments

feedback