CO SB238 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning home care agencies, and, in connection therewith, requiring certain agencies to expend a minimum percentage of their reimbursements from the "Colorado Medical Assistance Act" as wages for employees who provide direct care, requiring the department of health care policy and financing to enforce training requirements and request an increase to the reimbursement rate for certain services provided under the "Colorado Medical Assistance Act", and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improve Wages And Accountability Home Care Workers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.026) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-238 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-238 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-238, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-238, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.020 (Attachment A). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-238, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-238, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28 Governor Signed
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-01HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-30HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-30HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-26HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
2019-04-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-25SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-18SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-11SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-238
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_238_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_238_en2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_238_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_238_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_238_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_238_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e89b93e4b7e9e66b872583e00078118b-sb19-238-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2d7357c07cd18ec5872583e5004c8a01-sb19-238-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2d7357c07cd18ec5872583e5004c8a01-sb19-238-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-238vote5a64ac
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/32b3aca76c99aeb0872583eb00813904-sb19-238-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c188ef55cd092ee2872583ec004e40db-sb19-238-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-238vote010dcd
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-238vote59f8c2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e89b93e4b7e9e66b872583e00078118b-sb19-238-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e89b93e4b7e9e66b872583e00078118b-sb19-238-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback