CO SB239 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning means of addressing the impacts of technological and business model changes related to commercial vehicles, and, in connection therewith, requiring the department of transportation to convene and consult with a stakeholder group to examine impacts of new transportation technologies and business models, identify means of addressing impacts, and report findings and make recommendations to the general assembly.
Title
Address Impacts Of Transportation Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-239, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-239, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment V). (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-239, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment U). (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-239, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-239, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-239, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment V). (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-239, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment U). (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-239, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |