CO SB241 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the nonsubstantive revision of statutes in the Colorado Revised Statutes, as amended, and, in connection therewith, amending or repealing obsolete, imperfect, and inoperative law to preserve the legislative intent, effect, and meaning of the law.
Title
Revisor's Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-241 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-241 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-241 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-241 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |