CO SB254 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Community Corrections Release Options
Title
Community Corrections Release Options
Sponsors
Rep. Sal Pace [D] | Sen. Pat Steadman [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-254 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-254 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-254 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-254, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-254, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-254, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-254 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-254 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-254, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-254, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-254, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-16 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-11 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-09 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-05-05 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-05-03 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-29 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-21 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |