CO SB254 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fleet Vehicle Energy Cost-savings Contracts
Title
Fleet Vehicle Energy Cost-savings Contracts
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Jones [D] | Rep. Max Tyler [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-254 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-254 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 13-254 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 13-254 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-254 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 13-254 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 13-254 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-05-01 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |