CO SB255 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the establishment of the ratio of valuation for assessment for residential real property.
Title
Gallagher Amendment Residential Assessment Rate
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Court [D] | Sen. John Tate [R] | Rep. Leslie Herod [D] | Rep. Daneya Esgar [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-255 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-255 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-255 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-255 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-29 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |