CO SB257 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning amendments to the state income tax deduction for contributions to a qualified 529 account to ensure that the state income tax deduction is not aligned with the changes in the federal "Tax Cuts and Jobs Act" of 2017 that allow tax-free distributions for elementary and secondary school expenses.
Title
Protect Collegeinvest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-257 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-257, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-257, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-257, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-257, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-05-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |