CO SB258 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning child welfare services funded through federal child welfare laws, and, in connection therewith, making and reducing an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare Prevention and Intervention Funding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-258 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-258, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23 Governor Signed
2019-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-27HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-25HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-24SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-24SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-19SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-258
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_258_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_258_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_258_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_258_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_258_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_258_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/81f1ab39142a4054872583e6004c1010-sb19-258-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/81f1ab39142a4054872583e6004c1010-sb19-258-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-258vote566b20
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3bcce7ab43d55f3c872583e9004f2afb-sb19-258-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-258vote58cf02

Bill Comments

feedback