CO SB261 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the transfer of money from the unclaimed property trust fund to the general fund.
Title
Unclaimed Property Trust Fund Transfer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-261 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-261 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-261 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-261 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-05-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |