CO SB262 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a one-time transfer of one hundred million dollars from the general fund to the highway users tax fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Fund Transfer To Highway Users Tax Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Adhere (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-262, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-262 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03 Governor Signed
2019-05-21 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-02SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-05-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-05-01HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2019-05-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-04-27SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-262
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_262_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_262_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_262_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_262_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_262_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_262_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/d5c3e465400e23f1872583e900805bab-sb19-262-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-262vote5849dc
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c9a26d51f383dd0d872583ed007c2165-sb19-262-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-262vote73ac88
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-262vote17b470
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-262vote17a75b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-262vote179ae6

Bill Comments

feedback