CO SB263 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the delay until the November 2020 general election of the requirement that a ballot issue seeking approval for the issuance of transportation revenue anticipation notes be submitted to the voters of the state at the November 2019 statewide election, and, in connection therewith, amending the ballot issue to reduce the amount of notes authorized to be issued to offset the additional transportation funding that will result from the repeal of only two, rather than three, tranches of lease-purchase agreements authorized by Senate Bill 17-267 if the ballot issue is approved and extending from twenty to twenty-one years the period for which annual fifty million dollar transfers from the general fund to the state highway fund are required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Delay Referral Of TRANs Transportation Revenue Anticipation Notes Ballot Issue To 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-263 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-263 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Governor Signed
2019-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-05-01HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
2019-05-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-04-27SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-263
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_263_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_263_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_263_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_263_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_263_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_263_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/955c4609204d0cff872583e90081af85-sb19-263-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-263vote581c21
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/090374dee56e9cd9872583ed007ca235-sb19-263-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-263vote73daa0

Bill Comments

feedback