CO SCR001 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Submitting to the registered electors of the state of Colorado an amendment to the Colorado constitution to repeal the requirement that the general assembly periodically change the residential assessment rate in order to maintain the statewide proportion of residential property as compared to all other taxable property valued for property tax purposes and repeal the nonresidential property tax assessment rate of twenty-nine percent.
Title
Repeal Property Tax Assessment Rates
Sponsors
Sen. John Tate [R] | Sen. Chris Hansen [D] | Rep. Daneya Esgar [D] | Rep. Matt Soper [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.005) (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer SCR20-001 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Concurrent Resolution (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Concurrent Resolution (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer SCR20-001 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.005) (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer SCR20-001 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Concurrent Resolution (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Concurrent Resolution (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer SCR20-001 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-06-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |