CO SJM001 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializing the United States Congress to fulfill the commitment of the federal government to provide funding for the Arkansas Valley Conduit project.
Title
Memorial For Arkansas Valley Conduit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: MEMORIALS Mem (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Referred to Full House for final action. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Memorials Memorial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Referred to Full Senate for final action and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Referred to Full House for final action. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Memorials Memorial (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Referred to Full Senate for final action and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-02-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-11 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |