CO SJR003 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the fifty-first anniversary of the capture of the U.S.S. Pueblo by North Korea.
Title
U.S.S. Pueblo
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-02-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-30 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/01/2019 - No Amendments |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |