CO SJR010 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-21 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-21 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Request Judicial Action On Juvenile Defense
Title
Request Judicial Action On Juvenile Defense
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 4/21/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/07/2014 - No Amendments |