CO SJR010 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-11 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-11 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the designation of Colorado State Highway 84 between Pagosa Springs and the Colorado state line as the "Nolan Olson Memorial Highway".
Title
Designate Nolan Olson Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Res (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Joint Resolution 18-010 to the full House of Representatives. (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Joint Resolution 18-010 to the full House of Representatives. (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |