CO SJR010 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning changes to the joint rules of the senate and house of representatives to implement changes in workplace policies.
Title
Joint Rule Changes For Workplace Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-03 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Amend (l.001) (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Amend (l.001) (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |