CO SJR010 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning honoring gold star families.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honoring Gold Star Families

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-02-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-02-10HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-07HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-07HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to
2020-02-07SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-05SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/07/2020 - No Amendments
2020-02-05SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback