CO SJR016 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Summary
Peace Corps Anniversary
Title
Peace Corps Anniversary
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-03-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-04 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/04/2010 | |
2010-03-01 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/C9FC196D7BF65F0F872576CE00756897?Open |