CO SJR016 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - House Third Reading Passed
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - House Third Reading Passed
Summary
Legislative Deadlines For Interim Cmt Legislation
Title
Legislative Deadlines For Interim Cmt Legislation
Sponsors
Sen. John Morse [D] | Rep. Amy Stephens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-29 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/48DF8E49EF17CAD48725799100672B7C?Open |