CO SJR016 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the Maestas desegregation case.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maestas Desegregation Case

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-02-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-02-24HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to
2020-02-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-20SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/24/2020 - No Amendments
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback