CO SJR022 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Summary
Changes To Joint Legislative Rules
Title
Changes To Joint Legislative Rules
Sponsors
Sen. John Morse [D] | Rep. Amy Stephens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-11 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-08 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-07 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | |
2011-03-04 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B63341278FCE8C50872578230060E1CF?Open |