CO SJR023 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the designation of March 22, 2017, as 'Colorado Agriculture Day'.
Title
Colorado Agriculture Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |