CO SM002 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializing Congress to recognize correctional workers at the Federal Correctional Complex in Florence, Colorado, and, in connection therewith, to provide fair and uninterrupted compensation for their essential work during federal government shutdowns.
Title
Recognizing Workers at US Correctional Complex Colorado
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Memorials Memorial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/19/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |