CT HB05001 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 73-8-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a task force to study workforce training needs in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring A Study Of Workforce Training Needs In The State.

Sponsors

House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee CommitteeRep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D]Rep. Matthew Ritter [D]Rep. Alphonse Paolillo [D]
Rep. Anne Hughes [D]Rep. Bob Godfrey [D]Rep. Robert Sanchez [D]Rep. Caroline Simmons [D]
Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D]Rep. Christine Conley [D]Rep. Christine Palm [D]Rep. Christopher Rosario [D]
Rep. Cristin McCarthy Vahey [D]Rep. David Michel [D]Sen. Derek Slap [D]Rep. Edwin Vargas [D]
Rep. Emmett Riley [D]Rep. Gary Turco [D]Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D]Rep. Gregory Haddad [D]
Rep. Hilda Santiago [D]Rep. John Hennessy [D]Rep. Jane Garibay [D]Rep. Jillian Gilchrest [D]
Rep. Joe De la cruz [D]Rep. John Hampton [D]Rep. Joseph Gresko [D]Rep. Joshua Elliott [D]
Rep. Joshua Hall [D]Rep. Juan Candelaria [D]Rep. Julio Concepcion [D]Rep. Kara Rochelle [D]
Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D]Rep. Kevin Ryan [D]Rep. Kim Rose [D]Rep. Larry Butler [D]
Rep. Linda Orange [D]Rep. Liz Linehan [D]Rep. Lucy Dathan [D]Rep. Michael D'Agostino [D]
Rep. Michael Dimassa [D]Rep. Michael Winkler [D]Rep. Mike Demicco [D]Rep. Minnie Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Patricia Dillon [D]Rep. Roland Lemar [D]Rep. Ronald Napoli [D]Rep. Russell Morin [D]
Rep. Steven Stafstrom [D]Rep. Tom Arnone [D]Rep. Kate Rotella [D]Rep. Patrick Boyd [D]
Rep. Geoffrey Luxenberg [D]Rep. Travis Simms [D]Rep. Pat Wilson Pheanious [D]Rep. Susan Johnson [D]
Rep. Peter Tercyak [D]Rep. Robyn Porter [D]Rep. Dorinda Keenan Borer [D]Rep. Ezequiel Santiago [D]
Rep. Terrie Wood [R]Rep. Christopher Ziogas [D]Sen. John Kissel [R]Rep. Antonio Felipe [D]
Rep. Rick Lopes [D]Rep. Tom Delnicki [R]Rep. Tammy Exum [D]Sen. Tony Hwang [R]
Sen. Saud Anwar [D]Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D]Sen. Robert Sampson [R]Sen. Norman Needleman [D]
Sen. Catherine Osten [D]Sen. Kevin Kelly [R]Sen. Alexandra Bergstein [D]Rep. Brandon McGee [D]
Sen. George Logan [R]Sen. Mary Daugherty Abrams [D]Rep. Joseph Serra [D]Rep. Robin Comey [D]
Sen. Gennaro Bizzarro [R]Sen. Carlo Leone [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 346 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 373 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12SenateVetoed by the Governor
2019-06-28SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-26SenatePublic Act 19-198
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateRules Suspended
2019-06-05SenateSenate Calendar Number 691
2019-06-05SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-06-05SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-05HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 11013
2019-03-28HouseFile Number 170
2019-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 120
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2019-03-08HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-01HousePublic Hearing 02/05
2019-01-24HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback