CT HB05002 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 82-13-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To authorize the procurement of energy derived from anaerobic digestion and to require the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management to study the return on investment from fully implementing certain provisions of the general statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning A Green Economy And Environmental Protection.

Sponsors

House Energy and Technology Committee CommitteeRep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D]Rep. Matthew Ritter [D]Rep. Alphonse Paolillo [D]
Rep. Anne Hughes [D]Rep. Bob Godfrey [D]Rep. Robert Sanchez [D]Rep. Caroline Simmons [D]
Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D]Rep. Christine Conley [D]Rep. Christine Palm [D]Rep. Christopher Rosario [D]
Rep. Cristin McCarthy Vahey [D]Rep. David Arconti [D]Rep. David Michel [D]Sen. Derek Slap [D]
Rep. Edwin Vargas [D]Rep. Emmett Riley [D]Rep. Gary Turco [D]Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D]
Rep. Gregory Haddad [D]Rep. Hilda Santiago [D]Rep. John Hennessy [D]Rep. Jane Garibay [D]
Rep. Jillian Gilchrest [D]Rep. Joe De la cruz [D]Rep. John Hampton [D]Rep. Jonathan Steinberg [D]
Rep. Joseph Gresko [D]Rep. Joshua Elliott [D]Rep. Joshua Hall [D]Rep. Juan Candelaria [D]
Rep. Julio Concepcion [D]Rep. Kara Rochelle [D]Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D]Rep. Kerry Szeps Wood [D]
Rep. Kevin Ryan [D]Rep. Kim Rose [D]Rep. Larry Butler [D]Rep. Linda Orange [D]
Rep. Liz Linehan [D]Rep. Lucy Dathan [D]Rep. Michael D'Agostino [D]Rep. Michael Dimassa [D]
Rep. Michael Winkler [D]Rep. Mike Demicco [D]Rep. Minnie Gonzalez [D]Rep. Patricia Dillon [D]
Rep. Raghib Allie-Brennan [D]Rep. Roland Lemar [D]Rep. Ronald Napoli [D]Rep. Russell Morin [D]
Rep. Steven Stafstrom [D]Rep. Tom Arnone [D]Rep. Kate Rotella [D]Rep. Geoffrey Luxenberg [D]
Rep. Travis Simms [D]Rep. Pat Wilson Pheanious [D]Rep. Susan Johnson [D]Rep. Peter Tercyak [D]
Rep. Robyn Porter [D]Rep. Jason Doucette [D]Rep. Dorinda Keenan Borer [D]Rep. Ezequiel Santiago [D]
Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D]Rep. Christopher Perone [D]Rep. Anthony Nolan [D]Rep. Bobby Gibson [D]
Sen. Gary Winfield [D]Rep. Patrick Boyd [D]Rep. Rick Lopes [D]Rep. Quentin Phipps [D]
Rep. Devin Carney [R]Rep. Terrie Wood [R]Rep. Robin Comey [D]Rep. William Petit [R]
Rep. Olivia Floren [R]Rep. John Frey [R]Rep. Emil Altobello [D]Rep. Charlie Stallworth [D]
Sen. Saud Anwar [D]Sen. Alexandra Bergstein [D]Rep. Fred Camillo [R]Sen. Paul Formica [R]
Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R]Sen. James Maroney [D]Sen. Gennaro Bizzarro [R]Rep. Patricia Miller [D]
Rep. Matt Blumenthal [D]Sen. Dan Champagne [R]Rep. Antonio Felipe [D]Rep. Jeffrey Currey [D]
Rep. Tom Delnicki [R]Sen. Kevin Kelly [R]Sen. George Logan [R]Rep. Joseph Serra [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 320 PASS (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 216 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-17HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-17HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-12HousePublic Act 19-35
2019-06-04HouseIn Concurrence
2019-06-04HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-04HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-30HouseFile Number 1013
2019-05-30HouseSenate Calendar Number 631
2019-05-30HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-28HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-28HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9844
2019-05-20HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-20HouseNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-20HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-17HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-17HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-16HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 385
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 238
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-20HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-19HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
2019-03-15HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-26HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-15HousePublic Hearing 02/21
2019-02-05HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB05002&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-05002-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-05002-R01-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-05002-R02-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HB-05002-R03-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/pa/pdf/2019PA-00035-R00HB-05002-PA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-05002-R00ET-CV3-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-05002-R00ET-CV50-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-05002-R00ET-CV79-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HB-05002-R00APP-CV96-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00216-R00HB05002-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00320-R00HB05002-SV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback