CT HB05003 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish a paid family and medical leave system in Connecticut.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Implementing A Paid Family Medical Leave Program.

Sponsors

House Labor and Public Employees Committee CommitteeRep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D]Rep. Matthew Ritter [D]Rep. Alphonse Paolillo [D]
Rep. Anne Hughes [D]Rep. Bob Godfrey [D]Rep. Robert Sanchez [D]Rep. Caroline Simmons [D]
Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D]Rep. Christine Conley [D]Rep. Christine Palm [D]Rep. Christopher Rosario [D]
Rep. Cristin McCarthy Vahey [D]Rep. David Arconti [D]Rep. David Michel [D]Sen. Derek Slap [D]
Rep. Edwin Vargas [D]Rep. Emmett Riley [D]Rep. Gary Turco [D]Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D]
Rep. Gregory Haddad [D]Rep. Hilda Santiago [D]Rep. John Hennessy [D]Rep. Jane Garibay [D]
Rep. Jillian Gilchrest [D]Rep. Joe De la cruz [D]Rep. Joshua Elliott [D]Rep. Joshua Hall [D]
Rep. Juan Candelaria [D]Rep. Julio Concepcion [D]Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D]Rep. Kevin Ryan [D]
Rep. Kim Rose [D]Rep. Larry Butler [D]Rep. Linda Orange [D]Rep. Lucy Dathan [D]
Rep. Michael D'Agostino [D]Rep. Michael Dimassa [D]Rep. Michael Winkler [D]Rep. Mike Demicco [D]
Rep. Minnie Gonzalez [D]Rep. Patricia Dillon [D]Rep. Robin Comey [D]Rep. Roland Lemar [D]
Rep. Ronald Napoli [D]Rep. Russell Morin [D]Rep. Steven Stafstrom [D]Rep. Tom Arnone [D]
Rep. Kate Rotella [D]Rep. Geoffrey Luxenberg [D]Rep. Travis Simms [D]Rep. Pat Wilson Pheanious [D]
Rep. Susan Johnson [D]Rep. Peter Tercyak [D]Rep. Robyn Porter [D]Rep. Jason Doucette [D]
Rep. Dorinda Keenan Borer [D]Rep. Ezequiel Santiago [D]Rep. Brandon McGee [D]Rep. Rick Lopes [D]
Rep. Christopher Perone [D]

Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-16HouseNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-04-16HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-16HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-15HouseJoint Favorable
2019-04-04HouseReferred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-03-07HouseFile Number 22
2019-03-07HouseHouse Calendar Number 29
2019-03-07HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-07HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM
2019-02-20HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-02-19HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-02-06HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-01-15HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback