CT HB05004 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 67-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 67-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To provide more economic security to Connecticut families by increasing the minimum fair wage.
Title
An Act Increasing The Minimum Fair Wage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 163 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8914 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 164 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 8873 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 165 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 8866 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 166 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 8893 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 167 PASS (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 92 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 52 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 92 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 52 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 93 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 59 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 94 HOUSE AMD D (Y: 59 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 93 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 59 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 94 HOUSE AMD D (Y: 59 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 95 HOUSE AMD E (Y: 59 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 95 HOUSE AMD E (Y: 59 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 96 HOUSE AMD F (Y: 58 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 96 HOUSE AMD F (Y: 58 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 97 HOUSE AMD G (Y: 56 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 98 HOUSE AMD H (Y: 56 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 99 HOUSE AMD I (Y: 54 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 100 AS AMENDED (Y: 85 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 97 HOUSE AMD G (Y: 56 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 98 HOUSE AMD H (Y: 56 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 99 HOUSE AMD I (Y: 54 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 100 AS AMENDED (Y: 85 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 91 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 84 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 91 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 84 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 20 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 164 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 8873 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 165 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 8866 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 166 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 8893 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 167 PASS (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 92 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 52 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 92 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 52 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 93 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 59 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 94 HOUSE AMD D (Y: 59 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 93 HOUSE AMD C (Y: 59 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 94 HOUSE AMD D (Y: 59 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 95 HOUSE AMD E (Y: 59 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 95 HOUSE AMD E (Y: 59 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 96 HOUSE AMD F (Y: 58 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 96 HOUSE AMD F (Y: 58 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 97 HOUSE AMD G (Y: 56 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 98 HOUSE AMD H (Y: 56 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 99 HOUSE AMD I (Y: 54 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 100 AS AMENDED (Y: 85 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 97 HOUSE AMD G (Y: 56 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 98 HOUSE AMD H (Y: 56 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 99 HOUSE AMD I (Y: 54 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 100 AS AMENDED (Y: 85 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 91 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 84 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 91 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 84 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 20 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-05-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-05-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-05-20 | House | Public Act 19-4 |
2019-05-16 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 8893 |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8866 |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8873 |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8914 |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-10 | House | File Number 870 |
2019-05-10 | House | Senate Calendar Number 475 |
2019-05-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-09 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-08 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule I 8280 |
2019-05-08 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule H 8266 |
2019-05-08 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule G 8201 |
2019-05-08 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule F 8281 |
2019-05-08 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule E 8197 |
2019-05-08 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 8204 |
2019-05-08 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 8259 |
2019-05-08 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 8268 |
2019-05-08 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8234 |
2019-05-07 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-07 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-02 | House | File Number 267 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 173 |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-02-26 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-15 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |