CT HB05005 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) extend the angel investor tax credit program for five years; (2) increase the aggregate amount of angel investor tax credits that may be reserved annually by Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated from three million dollars to five million dollars; (3) increase the maximum total tax credits allowed to an angel investor from two hundred fifty thousand dollars to five hundred thousand dollars; (4) prioritize angel investments in veteran-owned, women-owned or minority-owned businesses and businesses owned by individuals with disabilities; and (5) expand eligibility for the state's set-aside program for small contractors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Extending The Angel Investor Tax Credit Program And Expanding Eligibility For The State's Set-aside Program For Small Contractors.

Sponsors

House Commerce Committee CommitteeRep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D]Rep. Matthew Ritter [D]Rep. Alphonse Paolillo [D]
Rep. Anne Hughes [D]Rep. Bob Godfrey [D]Rep. Robert Sanchez [D]Rep. Caroline Simmons [D]
Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D]Rep. Christine Conley [D]Rep. Christine Palm [D]Rep. Christopher Rosario [D]
Rep. Cristin McCarthy Vahey [D]Rep. David Arconti [D]Rep. David Michel [D]Sen. Derek Slap [D]
Rep. Edwin Vargas [D]Rep. Emmett Riley [D]Rep. Gary Turco [D]Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D]
Rep. Hilda Santiago [D]Rep. John Hennessy [D]Rep. Jane Garibay [D]Rep. Jillian Gilchrest [D]
Rep. Joe De la cruz [D]Rep. John Hampton [D]Rep. Jonathan Steinberg [D]Rep. Joseph Gresko [D]
Rep. Joshua Elliott [D]Rep. Joshua Hall [D]Rep. Juan Candelaria [D]Rep. Julio Concepcion [D]
Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D]Rep. Kerry Szeps Wood [D]Rep. Kevin Ryan [D]Rep. Kim Rose [D]
Rep. Larry Butler [D]Rep. Linda Orange [D]Rep. Liz Linehan [D]Rep. Lucy Dathan [D]
Rep. Michael D'Agostino [D]Rep. Michael Dimassa [D]Rep. Michael Winkler [D]Rep. Mike Demicco [D]
Rep. Minnie Gonzalez [D]Rep. Patricia Dillon [D]Rep. Raghib Allie-Brennan [D]Rep. Roland Lemar [D]
Rep. Ronald Napoli [D]Rep. Russell Morin [D]Rep. Steven Stafstrom [D]Rep. Tom Arnone [D]
Rep. Kate Rotella [D]Rep. Geoffrey Luxenberg [D]Rep. Travis Simms [D]Rep. Pat Wilson Pheanious [D]
Rep. Peter Tercyak [D]Rep. Patrick Boyd [D]Rep. Robyn Porter [D]Rep. Dorinda Keenan Borer [D]
Rep. Ezequiel Santiago [D]Sen. Norman Needleman [D]Rep. Christopher Ziogas [D]Rep. Kara Rochelle [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2019-05-14HouseNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-05-14HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-05-14HouseJoint Favorable
2019-05-10HouseReferred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2019-04-01HouseFile Number 239
2019-04-01HouseHouse Calendar Number 157
2019-04-01HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-01HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/12
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce
2019-03-06HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-28HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback