CT HB05007 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Public Hearing 03/12
Pending: Joint Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - Public Hearing 03/12
Pending: Joint Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To examine the creation of a student loan reimbursement program through public-private partnerships to attract skilled labor to the state and meet the hiring needs of private sector employers in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning A Student Loan Reimbursement Program For Certain Private Sector Employees In High-demand Fields.
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | Rep. Kerry Szeps Wood [D] | Rep. Jason Doucette [D] | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] |
Rep. Jillian Gilchrest [D] | Sen. Alexandra Kasser [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/12 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |
2019-03-06 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |