CT HB05044 | 2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - File Number 4
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To protect the public health by ensuring adequate and appropriate immunizations of children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Immunizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet-A (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseFile Number 4
2020-03-10HouseHouse Calendar Number 35
2020-03-10HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2020-03-10HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2020-03-03HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/20 5:00 PM
2020-02-25HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2020-02-24HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2020-02-13HousePublic Hearing 02/19
2020-02-10HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback