CT HB05053 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Senate Calendar Number 685
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To increase employment opportunities for persons recovering from substance abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Task Force To Increase Employment Opportunities For Persons Recovering From Substance Abuse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 328 (Y: 144 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateSenate Calendar Number 685
2019-06-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-06-04SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-04HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-02HouseFile Number 268
2019-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 174
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-02HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-02-26HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-19HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/14
2019-01-29HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback