CT HB05099 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To encourage the purchase of long-term care insurance.
Title
An Act Concerning An Income Tax Deduction For Long-term Care Insurance Premiums.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2020-03-05 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2020-02-14 | House | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |